MD HB285 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to certify annually the amount of assessable base for real property located in a specified development district; applying the Act to the calculation of payment of State education aid to counties and Baltimore City for fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2017; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that specified recommendations regarding education funding shall consider the impact of economic development incentives in low wealth jurisdictions on State education aid; etc.
Title
State Education Aid - Real Property Valuation - Tax Increment Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2016-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {414964/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Budgets
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Grants
Laws and Ordinances
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Sunset
Time
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Budgets
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Grants
Laws and Ordinances
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Sunset
Time