MD HB285 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-25 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-25 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified persons or the Commission on Human Relations to elect to have the claims asserted in a complaint alleging discrimination by a place of public accommodation determined in a civil action brought by the Commission; expanding the remedies available for specified discrimination; clarifying the remedies available for an unlawful employment practice; authorizing a complainant alleging specified discrimination to bring a civil action under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation -
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] |
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (91-44) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-03 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-03 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-01 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Damages
Discrimination
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations Commission
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Restaurants
Stadiums
Statutes of Limitation
Theaters
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Damages
Discrimination
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations Commission
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Restaurants
Stadiums
Statutes of Limitation
Theaters
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment