MD HB285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1097
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Moving from October 31, 2023, to October 31, 2024, the deadline for the reporting requirement for the Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity; and extending from June 30, 2024, to December 31, 2024, the termination date for the Task Force.
Title
Task Force on Property Appraisal and Valuation Equity - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-7) |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1097 (Carry Over) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 654
SB518 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
SB518 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Subjects
Appraisals
Committees and Commissions
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Sunset
Supreme Court of Maryland
Committees and Commissions
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Sunset
Supreme Court of Maryland
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2022 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |