MD HB283 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Pharmacy in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2023, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; repealing specified provisions relating to physician-pharmacist agreements to be approved by the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Pharmacy; repealing a provision requiring fees related to therapy management to be established in regulations; etc.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sunset Extension and Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Muse) Adopted | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 424031/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments 146983/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Drugs
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Contracts
Drugs
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment