MD HB281 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "net estate", for purposes of provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a specified share of the net estate of the decedent instead of the property left to the surviving spouse under the will, to include property of a revocable trust of the decedent; requiring that the share of a surviving spouse who makes the election be paid from the decedent's estate and each revocable trust of the decedent in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {786981/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |