MD HB281 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a provision of law relating to the use of proceeds received by the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund and credited to a specified account does not apply to residential customers of a small rural electric cooperative; and requiring small rural electric cooperatives to distribute in a specified way money held as of June 1, 2011, in a specified escrow account.
Title
Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund - Small Rural Electric Cooperative -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Cooperative Associations
Energy Matters
Escrow Accounts
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services
Utilities
Energy Matters
Escrow Accounts
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Prices
Public Service Commission
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services
Utilities