MD HB280 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements and procedures governing certain programs that authorize installment payments for certain motor vehicle traffic citations or judgment debts; repealing certain provisions of law governing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration suspend the driver's license and vehicle registration of a certain debtor; clarifying that a person may satisfy certain traffic citations by entering into a certain installment payment plan; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 149 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {862714/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 150
Subjects
Certifications
Citations
Civil Actions
Courts
Driver Education
Fines
Judgments
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Citations
Civil Actions
Courts
Driver Education
Fines
Judgments
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Trials
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 504.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 17 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 17 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 17 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 17 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 17 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 17 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 26 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 26 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 27 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |