MD HB280 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the circumstances under which a police officer is required to charge by citation for certain misdemeanor or local ordinance violations that have an imprisonment penalty of up to 90 days; modifying the categories of offenses for which a police officer is authorized to charge by citation; and modifying the circumstances under which a police officer may charge a defendant by citation.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (88-47) |
2019-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Citations
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Warrants
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Warrants