MD HB280 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified organizations in Carroll County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the Board of County Commissioners for Carroll County before conducting a card game, card tournament, or casino event; requiring an organization that seeks a permit to meet specified requirements; requiring a permit holder to submit to the County Commissioners a financial report including information about winners of prizes; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2015-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {959138/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2015-03-23 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Korman) Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {355860/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Carroll County
Churches
County Commissioners
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fire Protection
Gaming
Hospitals
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Veterans
Churches
County Commissioners
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Fire Protection
Gaming
Hospitals
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Veterans