MD HB279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a specified disposition hearing; requiring the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a permanency planning hearing or guardianship hearing; providing that, if the juvenile court enters an order directing the provision of specified services to a specified child, the juvenile court retains jurisdiction for a specified period of time and for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {462819/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Family Law
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Parents and Guardians
Social Services
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Family Law
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Judicial Review
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Parents and Guardians
Social Services