MD HB279 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report on the status of the implementation of specified recommendations of the Abuser Registry Workgroup; and requiring the Department to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before September 1, 2016.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-01-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Abuse
Appropriations
Consumer Protection
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Law Enforcement
Long-Term Care
Negligence
Public Health
Registration
Reports
Appropriations
Consumer Protection
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Law Enforcement
Long-Term Care
Negligence
Public Health
Registration
Reports