MD HB278 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the Police Department of Baltimore City is an agency and instrumentality of the City of Baltimore, instead of the State; and providing that police officers of the department have the authority conferred under a certain provision of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Control of Police Department of Baltimore City

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback