MD HB277 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the juvenile court to conduct specified hearings within specified periods of time to review the status of specified children under its jurisdiction; requiring the juvenile court to take specified actions at a review hearing under the Act; and establishing that a specified hearing to review a child's permanency plan satisfies the requirements for a review hearing under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2013-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2013-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2013-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {652012/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2013-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0277&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0277f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0277t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0277_65201201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0277.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0277_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0277_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/veto_letters/hb0277.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0277,h-0354&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0277,s-0928&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments

feedback