MD HB276 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing certain funding for each county public library system for fiscal year 2028 and each fiscal year thereafter.
Title
Education - Libraries - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158 |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-7) |
2023-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB205 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159