MD HB276 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB213
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "clinical nurse specialist" and "practice as a clinical nurse specialist" for the purpose of authorizing clinical nurse specialists to prescribe drugs and durable medical equipment under regulations adopted by the State Board of Nursing; altering the definition of "authorized prescriber" for purposes of the Maryland Pharmacy Act to include clinical nurse specialists; and authorizing a licensed physician to personally prepare and dispense a prescription written by a clinical nurse specialist.
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB276 (Carry Over) 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
SB513 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
SB513 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-18 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Education
Equipment
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Hospices
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Education
Equipment
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Hospices
Job Training
Licenses
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 8 | 514 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0276?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0276f.pdf |