MD HB276 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a congregate care facility to allow a patient's or resident's family member to visit the patient or resident under certain circumstances; requiring a congregate care facility to allow for an alternate means of communication with the patient or resident, such as audio or video calls, if the congregate care facility determines the presence of certain visitors presents a danger to the health and safety of patients, residents, or staff; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congregate Care Facilities - Visitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22HouseHearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-10-26HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General6301(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback