MD HB276 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the length of time a school vehicle may be operated in Allegany County and Garrett County from 12 years to 15 years, unless it fails to meet the applicable school bus and motor vehicle safety standards.
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115 |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Allegany County
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Board of
Fire Protection
Garrett County
Inspections
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Safety
School Buses
State Police, Department of
Time
Administrative Agencies
Allegany County
Education - Local Bills
Education, State Board of
Fire Protection
Garrett County
Inspections
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Safety
School Buses
State Police, Department of
Time