MD HB276 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the statute of limitations applicable to specified civil actions relating to human trafficking; and providing that the Act may not be construed to apply retroactively to revive any action that was barred by the application of the period of limitations applicable before October 1, 2017.
Title
Human Trafficking - Civil Actions - Statute of Limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |