MD HB274 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch may not prohibit a dealer from listing on the dealer's website a vehicle for sale or lease at a certain price, coerce or require a dealer to list a certain price on the dealer's website, or take an adverse action against a dealer for listing a certain price on the dealer's website; and defining "purchase price" as the full delivered price of a vehicle, excluding only taxes, title fees and any freight or certain other disclosed dealer process charges.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] | Del. Shaneka Henson [D] | Del. Sheila Ruth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB659 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
SB615 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB615 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Industry and Technology
internet
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Retail Sales
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Industry and Technology
internet
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Retail Sales
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 15 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 15 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |