MD HB273 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the number of bottles of wine that may remain open at any one time at a wine sampling or tasting event in Frederick County to all bottles in a wine preservation system that the Board of License Commissioners approves and not more than six other bottles; altering the qualifications for signatories of a certificate accompanying a license application; providing for an alternative method for selecting signatories under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board to reduce a suspension under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464939/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fines
Frederick County
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Substance Abuse
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fines
Frederick County
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Substance Abuse