MD HB273 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on private property on Sundays during the spring turkey hunting season in Kent County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |