MD HB273 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person who is cited for unlawfully catching oysters may have a specified license revoked under specified circumstances; establishing grounds for license revocation; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to hold a hearing under specified circumstances in accordance with the Administrative Procedure Act; requiring the Department to revoke a person's license to catch oysters under specified circumstances; and prohibiting a person from engaging or working in a specified fishery under specified circumstances.
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Hearing
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Maggie McIntosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-03 | Third Reading Passed (126-11) | |
2011-03-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Environmental Matters |