MD HB270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the State Department of Education, the Department of General Services, and Maryland Occupational Safety and Health, to adopt regulations, under specified circumstances, to require periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public or nonpublic school buildings; requiring the Department of the Environment, before adopting regulations, to gather specified information regarding the establishment of lead-free school environments; etc.
Title
Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-23) (Y: 117 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-23) (Y: 117 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-23) |
2017-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {690012/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Water
Education, State Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Water