MD HB270 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Decreasing, from 4 to 3, the number of times a specified notice is required to be published in Dorchester County in connection with specified tax sales of property; altering the auctioneer's fee in Dorchester County allowed as an expense relating to specified tax sales of property to be $7.50 per property sold; etc.
Title
Dorchester County - Tax Sales - Advertisement and Auctioneer Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (136-2) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Ways and Means |