MD HB27 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the Clean Indoor Air Act to include a prohibition of the use of a certain electronic cigarette device under certain circumstances; defining the term "electronic cigarette device" as an electronic device that can be used to deliver nicotine or any other substance intended for human consumption to an individual to simulate smoking through the inhalation of vapor or aerosol from the device; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2019-01-21HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-16HouseHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-08-29HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback