MD HB27 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the sale, transfer, or other disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center property; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the General Assembly, and other specified entities on or before January 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {127977/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {190012/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-01-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2014-11-12 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Committees and Commissions
Environment, Department of
General Services, Department of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
State Hospitals
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Environment, Department of
General Services, Department of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
State Hospitals
Sunset
Transportation, Department of