MD HB27 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of a physical restraint on an inmate while the inmate is in labor or during delivery except under specified circumstances; requiring the specified responsible medical personnel to determine when the inmate's health allows the inmate to be returned to a correctional facility after giving birth; prohibiting, with specified exceptions, a physical restraint from being used on a specified inmate; requiring specified correctional officials to develop a policy for use at each correctional facility; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-30 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212
2014-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2014-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2014-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2014-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2014-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {688778/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-07SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2014-03-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {172512/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2014-01-28HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2013-11-07HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0027&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0027f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0027t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0027e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_212_hb0027e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0027_17251201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0027_68877801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb0027.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0027_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0027_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0027,h-0281&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0027,s-0981&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0027,h-1219&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback