MD HB27 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Recommit to Committee Education Health and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Recommit to Committee Education Health and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting former State officials or public officials of the Executive Branch who had duties substantially related to State legislative matters and the General Assembly, for 1 year after leaving State employment, from assisting or representing another party for compensation in a matter that is the subject of legislative action; providing exceptions that permit the former officials to represent a municipal corporation, county, or State governmental entity; etc.
Title
Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Recommit to Committee Education Health and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) | |
2011-04-08 | Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (134-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-13 | First Reading Environmental Matters |