MD HB269 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that an owner of a specified vessel submit a written request to the Department of Natural Resources to prohibit the Department from disclosing specified information to any person; narrowing the prohibition against and exception for the disclosure of specified records held by the Department by applying the prohibition and exception only to personal information about the owner of a registered vessel; and clarifying the application of specified exceptions to the prohibition.
Title
Natural Resources - Boating - Disclosure of Personal Information
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 804232/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (106-12) | |
2012-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-01-30 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters |