MD HB266 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person convicted of prostitution to file a motion to vacate the judgment under specified circumstances; establishing the requirements for a motion filed under the Act; requiring the court to hold a hearing on the motion under specified circumstances, with a specified exception; etc.
Title
Human Trafficking Victim Protection Act
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Sam Arora [D] | Del. Susan Aumann [R] |
Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-06 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-08 | Delegates Dumais, Lee, and McDermott | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-08 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-08 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Hearings
Human Rights
Judgments
Notices
Petitions
Prostitution
Restitution
State's Attorneys
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Hearings
Human Rights
Judgments
Notices
Petitions
Prostitution
Restitution
State's Attorneys
Victims