MD HB264 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Dorchester County to use specified local highway user revenues for costs incurred to light specified highways.
Title
Dorchester County - Authorized Use of Highway User Revenues - Highway Lighting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |