MD HB262 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 141
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the Maryland Department of Health have access to certain information maintained by the Judiciary about a criminal defendant who is subject to a certain examination, committed to the Health Department, or on conditional release under certain circumstances; and requiring the Department and the Judiciary to enter into an agreement regarding certain matters before exchanging any information.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Examination of Defendant by Maryland Department of Health - Access to Judicial Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 141 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Examinations
Health, Department of
Records
Courts
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
Examinations
Health, Department of
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 3 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |