MD HB262 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring institutions of higher education that receive State funds to provide specified information to students regarding their education loans on or before October 15 each year; prohibiting an institution of higher education from incurring a specified liability; etc.
Title
Student Debt Disclosure Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |