MD HB262 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of funding required to be included in the annual State budget for the Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund to $750,000; requiring that $400,000 of the Fund be distributed to counties based on each county's share of the senior citizen population; providing a minimum distribution of $5,000 per county; and requiring $250,000 of the Fund be distributed to distressed counties in a specified manner.
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-13) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Reznik) {163220/1 Adopted |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {664569/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Revenue and Taxes
Unemployment
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Elderly
Elderly Persons
Revenue and Taxes
Unemployment