MD HB261 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB4
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an Executive Branch agency from banning or regulating the sale of coffee in conjunction with a career exploration and development activity in any public high school in Baltimore County; and repealing a certain exception that prohibited banning or regulating the sale of coffee in a Baltimore County public high school that sold coffee on or before June 30, 2018, in conjunction with a career exploration activity.
Title
Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Prohibiting a Ban or Regulation of Sale of Coffee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0261?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0261f.pdf |