MD HB261 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public service company that intends to terminate, because of nonpayment, electric or gas service to a specified customer to notify the property owner or manager before terminating service if the public service company has received a specified customer's consent; authorizing a specified property owner or manager to require, as a term of a specified lease, a specified tenant to assure that a specified customer provides consent for the property owner or manager to receive a specified notice of termination of services; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Del. Angela Angel [D] | Del. Tony Knotts [D] | Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Del. James Tarlau [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {427877/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {183294/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Condominiums
Consumer Protection
Housing
Notices
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Condominiums
Consumer Protection
Housing
Notices
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Utilities
Utility Regulation