MD HB261 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Declaring the intention of the General Assembly to monitor issues and determine whether modification of a specified Act is required; authorizing an individual to file an application for a statement of charges with a District Court commissioner; authorizing a District Court commissioner to issue a summons or an arrest warrant under specified circumstances; requiring a police officer to charge a person by citation for specified misdemeanors and local ordinance violations; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Defendants - Citations and Appearances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 918672/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-02 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-04-02 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | |
2012-04-02 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Vallario) 263426/1 Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments 282119/5 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Arrests
Attorneys
Bail
Circuit Courts
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Hearings
Indigent Persons
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Legislative Services, Department of
Minorities
Notices
Police Training Commission
Pretrial Detention or Release
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Sunset
Attorneys
Bail
Circuit Courts
Citations
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
District Courts
Emergency Bills
Ethnic Affairs
Evidence
Hearings
Indigent Persons
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Legal Aid
Legislative Services, Department of
Minorities
Notices
Police Training Commission
Pretrial Detention or Release
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Summonses
Sunset