MD HB256 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB478
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Emergency Management to study issues and factors regarding the feasibility of establishing a Waterway Incident Notification System to notify members of the public of certain waterway emergencies; and requiring the Department to submit an interim report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2024, and a final report on or before December 1, 2025.
Title
Waterway Incident Notification System (WINS) - Study
Sponsors
Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Todd Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546 |
2024-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {693726/1 Adopted |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. |
2024-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2023-09-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
HB478 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB478 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Armed Forces
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Dorchester County
Emergency Management, Department of
Emergency Services
Environment
Environment, Department of the
General Assembly
Information Technology, Department of
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Natural Resources
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Public Safety
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Salaries and Compensation
St. Mary's County
studies
Sunset
Water
Armed Forces
Coastal Bays
Committees and Commissions
Dorchester County
Emergency Management, Department of
Emergency Services
Environment
Environment, Department of the
General Assembly
Information Technology, Department of
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Natural Resources
Notices
Open Government
Public Information
Public Safety
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Salaries and Compensation
St. Mary's County
studies
Sunset
Water