MD HB256 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB165
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after July 1, 2020, to not exceed $1,000,000; and altering a certain limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after July 1, 2020, to not exceed $1,000,000.
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB256 (Carry Over) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 7 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0256?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0256f.pdf |