MD HB255 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-5)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a specified health care provider to provide a victim of sexual assault with written information describing the laws and policies governing the testing, preservation, and disposal of a sexual assault evidence collection kit; requiring a hospital or child advocacy center to transfer a sexual assault evidence collection kit to a law enforcement agency within 30 days of the exam; prohibiting a law enforcement agency from destroying or disposing of specified evidence of sexual assault within 20 years of its collection; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159
2017-04-07HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {882716/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2017-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-25HouseHearing canceled
2017-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0255&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0255f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0255t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_159_hb0255t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0255_88271601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0255.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0255_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0255_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0255,h-0309&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0255,s-1208&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback