MD HB255 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "search, contact, and reunion services" to include contacting specified adopted siblings of a minor in out-of- home placement for a specified purpose; authorizing a director of a local department of social services acting on behalf of a minor in out-of-home placement to apply for search, contact, and reunion services; etc.
Title
Family Law - Adoption Search, Contact, and Reunion Services - Siblings of
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Adoption
Disclosure
Family Law
Fees
Foster Care
Minors
Privacy
Records
Social Services
Social Workers
Adoption
Disclosure
Family Law
Fees
Foster Care
Minors
Privacy
Records
Social Services
Social Workers