MD HB253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court, in a final protective order, to order a wireless telephone service provider to transfer to a person eligible for relief the billing responsibility for and the right to continue the use of any telephone number used by the person eligible for relief or a minor child in the person's custody if the person eligible for relief is not the account holder; requiring a wireless telephone service provider to comply with a certain order unless the wireless telephone service provider notifies the court of certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {412816/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback