MD HB253 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "stinger-steered automobile transporter" to include certain vehicles not engaged exclusively in the transportation of automobiles or boats for purposes of certain provisions of law regulating vehicle length and loads; specifying that certain provisions of law regulating vehicle length and loads do not prohibit a backhaul by an automobile transporter; increasing the maximum allowable length of a certain stinger-steered automobile transporter; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Equipment
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Equipment
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures