MD HB250 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Barbers and Cosmetologists Boards' Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring that the Fund be used for specified purposes; requiring the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, or a designee of the Secretary, to administer the Fund; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the State Board of Barbers and the State Board of Cosmetologists, to annually calculate specified costs; etc.
Title
State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {723896/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Barbers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Comptroller
Cosmetologists
Fees
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Barbers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Comptroller
Cosmetologists
Fees
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations