MD HB250 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the applicability of specified appeal rights from a victim of a violent crime to a victim of a nonviolent crime; authorizing a victim to appeal to the Court of Special Appeals from a specified final order; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of Restitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {102311/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Victims
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Penalties and Sentences
Restitution
Victims