MD HB249 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering, in the case of a council of unit owners' responsibility to repair or replace damage to certain portions of a condominium, the circumstances under which the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible is a common expense; increasing the maximum amount of the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible for which a unit owner is responsible; and applying the Act to all policies of property and casualty insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State to a condominium council of unit owners; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {490314/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-24HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback