MD HB249 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide certain coverage for instruction by a licensed health care provider on fertility awareness-based methods; prohibiting the insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from applying a copayment, coinsurance requirement, or deductible to coverage for the instruction on fertility awareness-based methods, except with respect to a certain grandfathered exception; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage for Fertility Awareness-Based Methods

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-26SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2018-02-21HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-21HouseFavorable with Amendments {166386/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback