MD HB249 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing members of the National Guard whose employment and reemployment rights have been violated to bring a civil action for economic damages, including lost wages and benefits; and authorizing a court to award specified damages, fees, costs, and other relief to members of the National Guard if the court determines that the member's employment and reemployment rights were violated.
Title
Members of the National Guard - Employment and Reemployment Rights - Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-02-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {603093/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Judgments
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Judgments
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Work, Labor and Employment