MD HB247 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that provisions of law relating to durable powers of attorney apply to all powers of attorney; altering the authority of an agent under specified statutory form powers of attorney; providing that specified powers shall be deemed to be included in specified forms; defining "property" and "stocks and bonds"; altering the definition of "statutory form power of attorney"; etc.
Title
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (137-1) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Attorneys
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Financial Institutions
Forms
Guardians
Personal Property
Real Property
Securities
Attorneys
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Financial Institutions
Forms
Guardians
Personal Property
Real Property
Securities