MD HB246 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to fulfill a notice requirement for license applications by posting online a completed application with all submitted documents on or before a specified date; eliminating the fees for a specified certificate of permission and a specified license; repealing the requirement that the Governor appoint a full-time inspector; authorizing the Board to appoint a chief inspector and one full-time or two part-time inspectors; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232 |
2015-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {303197/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
County Councils
County Executives
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Fees
Fines
Frederick County
Gifts
Governor
Inspections
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Public Employees
Public Information
Reports
Security Interests
Work, Labor and Employment
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
County Councils
County Executives
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Government
Fees
Fines
Frederick County
Gifts
Governor
Inspections
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Public Employees
Public Information
Reports
Security Interests
Work, Labor and Employment